Date | Transaction |
02-28-1996 | Sammy Bishop has retired from football. |
09-03-1995 | The Boston Ghouls have waived Sammy Bishop. |
08-28-1995 | The Boston Ghouls have moved Fritz Chapura to the active roster. The Boston Ghouls have moved Sammy Bishop to the inactive roster. |
05-01-1994 | The Boston Ghouls have changed Samwise Bishop's name to Sammy Bishop. |
05-01-1994 | The Boston Ghouls have acquired Samwise Bishop from the waiver wire. |
09-21-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Jocher to the active roster. |
09-21-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have waived Samwise Bishop. |
09-21-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have waived Samwise Bishop. |
09-21-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Sam Bishop's name to Samwise Bishop. |
09-21-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Sam Bishop's name to Samwise Bishop. |
08-31-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Sam Bishop from the trade block. |
08-31-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Sam Bishop from the trade block. |
08-31-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Keith Lomack, Rob Constantine, Steve Hardison, Greg Lewis, Peter Praxis, Camp Fulcher, Nolan "Credence" Creed, Tom Marvel, Matthew Madison, Paul Erie, Ken Belanger, Billy Doink, and Reuben Carson to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved John Johnsos, Rick Townsend, Tom Tauscher, Sam Bishop, Teddy Sapolu, Darryl Johnson, John Cotton, and Joe Thornton to the inactive roster. |
05-03-1992 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Jocher, Charlie Podoley, Wilt Washington, Elmer Page, Tom Tauscher, Sam Bishop, Larry Simoneau, and Darryl Johnson to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Hans Heidenreich, Nolan "Credence" Creed, Billy Doink, Reuben Carson, Peter Praxis, Sebastian Sinclair, Charles Durham, and Keith Lomack to the inactive roster. |
09-01-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Hans Heidenreich, Nolan "Dr. No" Creed, Camp Fulcher, Peter Praxis, Quinn Jefferies, Bob Crockett, Charlie Evans, Jordan Thane, Matthias Black, Lucky Gamble, Charles Durham, and Keith Lomack to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Simon Zeal, Justice Jones, Charlie Podoley, Wilt Washington, Tom Tauscher, Sam Bishop, Teddy Sapolu, Chad Lapham, Warren Peace, Larry Simoneau, Grant Cavat, and Steve Hardison to the inactive roster. |
08-26-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Nolan "Dr. No" Creed to the inactive roster. |
08-19-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie and Lucky Gamble to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Alphonso "The Grey" Elric and Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
08-19-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Jocher, Shoichi Sansoon, Peter Stemrick, Charlie Podoley, Wilt Washington, Tom Tauscher, Sam Bishop, Teddy Sapolu, Chad Lapham, Warren Peace, Larry Simoneau, and Grant Cavat to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Simon Zeal, Hans Heidenreich, Nolan "Dr. No" Creed, Camp Fulcher, Peter Praxis, Quinn Jefferies, Bob Crockett, Charlie Evans, Tom Marvel, Matthias Black, Charles Durham, and Steve Hardison to the inactive roster. |
08-12-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie, Nolan "Dr. No" Creed, Matthew Madison, Camp Fulcher, Peter Praxis, Quinn Jefferies, Charlie Evans, Tom Marvel, Jordan Thane, Matthias Black, Lucky Gamble, and Charles Durham to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Jocher, Shoichi Sansoon, Peter Stemrick, Charlie Podoley, Wilt Washington, Tom Tauscher, Sam Bishop, Teddy Sapolu, Chad Lapham, Warren Peace, Larry Simoneau, and Grant Cavat to the inactive roster. |
08-05-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Cecil Weaver and Sam Bishop to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Nolan "Dr. No" Creed and Lucky Gamble to the inactive roster. |
08-05-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Nolan "Dr. No" Creed and Lucky Gamble to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Cecil Weaver and Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
08-05-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Jocher, Frank Heywood, Peter Stemrick, Charlie Podoley, Sam Bishop, Warren Peace, Larry Simoneau, and Grant Cavat to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie, Chris Miranoi, Nolan "Dr. No" Creed, Matthew Madison, Camp Fulcher, Quinn Jefferies, Charlie Evans, Tom Marvel, Jordan Thane, Matthias Black, Lucky Gamble, Sebastian Sinclair, and Charles Durham to the inactive roster. |
01-14-1991 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
01-13-1991 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Eric "The Red" Elric to the inactive roster. |
12-24-1990 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Eric Elric to the active roster. The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
12-24-1990 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The Los Angeles Capitolists have moved Eric Elric to the inactive roster. |
09-24-1990 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have placed Sam Bishop on the trade block. |
09-10-1990 | The Los Angeles Capitolists have acquired Sam Bishop from the waiver wire. |
09-03-1990 | The Colorado Rocky Mountains have waived Sam Bishop. |
08-06-1990 | The Colorado Mountains have moved Vince McMahon, Sam Bishop, and Bob Berry to the inactive roster. |
09-17-1989 | The Tulsa Timelords have moved Sam Bishop and Eugene Abbott to the active roster. |
09-17-1989 | The Tulsa Timelords have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
09-17-1989 | The Tulsa Timelords have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The Tulsa Timelords have moved Vince McMahon and Eugene Abbott to the inactive roster. |
09-17-1989 | Trade #47641 has been completed between the Tulsa Timelords and the San Jose Cylons. The San Jose Cylons receive Draft Pick - 1992 Round 4 (TUL) from the Tulsa Timelords in exchange for Sam Bishop (QB). |
08-07-1989 | The San Jose Cylons have moved Tom Harlow to the active roster. The San Jose Cylons have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1989 | The San Jose Cylons have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The San Jose Cylons have moved Damon Shaw to the inactive roster. |
08-08-1988 | The San Jose Cylons have placed Sam Bishop on the trade block. |
08-08-1988 | The San Jose Cylons have moved Tom Harlow to the active roster. The San Jose Cylons have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
05-01-1988 | The San Jose Cylons have moved Sam Bishop to the active roster. The San Jose Cylons have moved Clay Milne to the inactive roster. |
05-01-1988 | The San Jose Cylons have moved Damon Shaw to the active roster. The San Jose Cylons have moved Sam Bishop to the inactive roster. |
05-01-1988 | Trade #46332 has been completed between the Washington Capitolists and the San Jose Cylons. The San Jose Cylons receive Sam Bishop (QB), Draft Pick - 1990 Round 3 (WAS) from the Washington Capitolists in exchange for Jim Worden (QB). |
05-01-1988 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Samwise Bishop's name to Sam Bishop. |
09-14-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Simon Bishop's name to Samwise Bishop. |
09-14-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Samwise Bishop's name to Simon Bishop. |
09-13-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Sam Bishop's name to Samwise Bishop. |
08-31-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Samwise Bishop's name to Sam Bishop. |
08-24-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Samwise Bishop on the trade block. |
08-10-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Samwise Bishop from the trade block. |
08-10-1987 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Samwise Bishop on the trade block. |
09-08-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Sam Bishop's name to Samwise Bishop. |
08-18-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Sam Bishop's name to Sam Bishop. |
08-18-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Dexter Cuff's name to Sam Bishop. |
08-18-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Dexter Cuff to the active roster. |
08-17-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have reverted Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff's name to Dexter Cuff. |
08-11-1986 | The Washington Capitolists have acquired Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff from the waiver wire. |
08-04-1986 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Joe Pollard, Jimmy Skunk, Keith "Handsome" Racoon, Johnny Badger, and Ruben DeGrenier to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Bob James, Shipwreck Larson, FS SkateandSnow, and Mario "Chicken Thief" Duval to the inactive roster. |
08-04-1986 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have waived Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff. |
09-23-1985 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Herman Munster to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff to the inactive roster. |
09-16-1985 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Herman Munster to the inactive roster. |
08-25-1985 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Strudel "Von" Velcrohands and Sung "Yim" Po to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff and Bob Crawford to the inactive roster. |
08-11-1985 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have changed Dexter Cuff's name to Dexter "The Neglected One" Cuff. |
04-28-1985 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have acquired Dexter Cuff from the waiver wire. |