BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
C+
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (12-11-2123) |
Potential |
C+ |
Age at Death |
58
|
Born |
07-25-2065 in Bartow, FL |
Drafted |
Round 1, Pick 27 (2086) |
Experience |
11 Years (232 Wks) |
College |
Illinois State College, 2087 |
Salary |
845 ($5713.689M/2135 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
F |
Catching |
D |
Pass Cover |
F |
Kick Power |
D+ |
Throw Acc |
C+ |
Pass Blocking |
B- |
Run Cover |
F |
Kick Acc |
D+ |
Carrying |
C- |
Run Blocking |
C+ |
Tackling |
C- |
Kick Return |
D- |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
F |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
D- |
Stamina |
C- |
Execution |
C+ |
Agility |
C- |
Strength |
B |
Health |
F |
Aggressiveness |
C- |
Hands |
C+ |
Jumping |
F |
|
|
Attitude |
B- |
Break Tackle |
C- |
ROLES |
QB |
D+ |
C |
C |
DT |
C- |
SS |
D |
K |
F |
GUN |
C- |
WR |
D |
G |
C+ |
DE |
D+ |
FS |
D |
P |
D- |
KR |
D |
HB/TB |
D |
T |
C |
ILB |
C- |
CB |
D |
LS |
C |
KRB |
C- |
FB |
C- |
TE |
C- |
OLB |
C- |
H |
D+ |
HT |
C |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year |
Team |
ACT |
G |
GS |
COND |
INJ |
PEN |
PYDS |
TIME |
2086 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
0 |
91% |
0 |
3 |
15 |
236:49 |
2087 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
0 |
90% |
0 |
3 |
25 |
240:08 |
2088 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
0 |
91% |
0 |
3 |
20 |
272:05 |
2089 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
0 |
90% |
0 |
3 |
20 |
252:52 |
2090 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
3 |
92% |
0 |
7 |
60 |
308:17 |
2091 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
3 |
89% |
0 |
7 |
41 |
292:21 |
2092 |
SF |
14 |
8 |
8 |
93% |
6 |
0 |
0 |
221:43 |
2093 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
16 |
93% |
0 |
4 |
30 |
484:51 |
2094 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
16 |
92% |
0 |
3 |
25 |
493:59 |
2095 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
16 |
93% |
0 |
1 |
10 |
504:03 |
2096 |
SF |
16 |
16 |
16 |
93% |
0 |
2 |
15 |
270:12 |
Total |
|
174 |
168 |
78 |
91% |
6 |
36 |
261 |
3577:20 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2100 | Forrest McKinley has retired from football. |
09-02-2097 | The San Francisco Qmark have waived Forrest McKinley. |
08-19-2097 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Don Dixon to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Forrest McKinley to the inactive roster. |
09-03-2096 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Forrest McKinley to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Carlos Jackson to the inactive roster. |
08-06-2096 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Todd Gardner, George Ravensburg, and Buddy Emmons to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Leon Lankford, Forrest McKinley, and Mark Parker to the inactive roster. |
08-10-2093 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Brock Cole, Charlie Walker, Ron Reed, and Forrest McKinley to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Lawyer Poto, Frank Burrow, Bob Mintun, and Rusty Sabucco to the inactive roster. |
12-14-2092 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Rusty Sabucco and Bob Mintun to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Forrest McKinley and Kayo Williams to the inactive roster. |
11-02-2092 | Forrest McKinley of the San Francisco Qmark is injured with a complete MCL tear and is expected to be out for the rest of the season. |
08-05-2086 | The San Francisco Qmark have moved Russ Esiason, Odell Myhra, Forrest McKinley, and Cecil Graham to the active roster. The San Francisco Qmark have moved Nick Strzykalski, Jim Kozlowski, John Burke, and Keith Curran to the inactive roster. |
09-04-2084 | Forrest McKinley has been moved from C to G by the Illinois State College Cardinals. |