Date | Transaction |
02-28-2020 | Norm Siani has retired from football. |
12-08-2019 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have waived Norm Siani. |
09-20-2015 | Norm Siani of the San Antonio Silver Hawks is injured with an abdominal strain and is expected to be out for approximately 5 days. |
09-14-2015 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani and Mickey Brewer to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Carl Woodley to the inactive roster. |
09-14-2015 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani to the inactive roster. |
09-06-2015 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Kenyatta Shelby, Shane Gainer, Norm Siani, Bernie Bryant, Brian Wright, George Finnegan, Bill Lee, Hideki Nakamura, Pat Kirkman, Randal White, Leo Dufft, Stephen Ten, Dennis Jones, and Brett Brock to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Ike Pinkston, Bob Bryant, James Himes, Johnny Lightning, Vic Kelley, Pete Jenkins, Tom Schobel, Guido Strachan, Carl Woodley, Jon Weller, Ray Wortman, David Frost, Clarence Barker, and Clyde Dressel to the inactive roster. |
08-24-2015 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Clarence Barker, Johnny Lightning, Vic Kelley, Pete Jenkins, Tom Schobel, Carl Woodley, Ike Pinkston, Max Jessie, and Clyde Dressel to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Bernie Bryant, Hideki Nakamura, Kenyatta Shelby, Dennis Jones, Stephen Ten, Pat Kirkman, Norm Siani, David Frost, Chuck Smith, Brian Wright, and George Finnegan to the inactive roster. |
09-30-2012 | Norm Siani of the San Antonio Silver Hawks is injured with a hip contusion and is expected to be out for approximately 5 days. |
09-05-2010 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani, Tommy Hatch, Stephen Ten, Stan Hanson, Hideki Nakamura, Bernie Bryant, Viktor Vukavitch, Vernice Apolskis, Willie Wonka, Kendrick Pyburn, Pat Kirkman, Bob Lindsey, Marv White, and Brian Wright to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved John Winslow, Gary Compton, Stan Moon, Ben Perrigrine, Jim Solwold, Ron White, Rich St.Jean, Dave Russ, Tim Baca, Terence Walker, Johnny Macioszczyk, Ralph Freitas, and Greg Artoe to the inactive roster. |
08-22-2010 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Stan Moon, John Winslow, Carroll Jones, and Ralph Freitas to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Bernie Bryant, Hideki Nakamura, Norm Siani, and Tommy Hatch to the inactive roster. |
08-09-2010 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Carroll Jones to the inactive roster. |
08-09-2010 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani, Carroll Jones, and Hayward Henry to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Mike Creighton, Jim Solwold, Jack Hill, and Billy Karlis to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Mike Creighton, Jim Solwold, Jack Hill, Carroll Jones, and Billy Karlis to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Kendrick Pyburn, Bob Lindsey, Norm Siani, Brian Wright, and Willie Wonka to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Pat Kirkman, Brian Wright, Gary Killiher, Norm Siani, Willie Wonka, Marv White, and Bob Lindsey to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Carroll Jones, Billy Karlis, Stan Moon, Earl Barr, Greg Artoe, Chad Boyd, Ricky Akins, and Dave Russ to the inactive roster. |
08-31-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Earl Barr, Hal Bruggers, Howard Kanitbe, Greg Artoe, Dan Childress, Chad Boyd, Dave Russ, Carl Bleier, Isham Williams, and Billy Karlis to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Kendrick Pyburn, Hideki Nakamura, Johnny Macioszczyk, Larry Glenn, Pat Kirkman, Norm Siani, Brian Wright, Enid Kennedy, Willie Wonka, and Tommy Hatch to the inactive roster. |
08-10-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Mike Creighton to the inactive roster. |
08-10-2009 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani to the inactive roster. |
08-25-2008 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani and Carroll Jones to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Jim Solwold to the inactive roster. |
08-25-2008 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Norm Siani and Carroll Jones to the inactive roster. |
08-04-2008 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Pat Kirkman, Norm Siani, Carroll Jones, and Willie Hasselbeck to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Donny Barkum, Charlie Bolden, Stan Katolin, and Noah Cox to the inactive roster. |