BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Retired (1991) |
Potential |
D+ |
Age |
57
|
Born |
06-01-1955 in Lorain, OH |
Drafted |
Round 6, Pick 130 (1977) |
Experience |
9 Years (184 Wks) |
College |
College of Arizona, 1977 |
Salary |
1012 ($1.338M/2013 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D+ |
Catching |
D- |
Pass Cover |
F |
Kick Power |
C+ |
Throw Acc |
D+ |
Pass Blocking |
F |
Run Cover |
C- |
Kick Acc |
A |
Carrying |
D+ |
Run Blocking |
D- |
Tackling |
F |
Kick Return |
D- |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
D- |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
D+ |
Stamina |
D |
Execution |
B |
Agility |
D+ |
Strength |
D |
Health |
C |
Aggressiveness |
C |
Hands |
D |
Jumping |
C- |
|
|
Attitude |
B- |
Break Tackle |
C- |
ROLES |
QB |
D- |
C |
D- |
DT |
D |
SS |
D |
K |
B- |
GUN |
D |
WR |
D |
G |
D- |
DE |
D |
FS |
D- |
P |
D+ |
KR |
D |
HB/TB |
D |
T |
D- |
ILB |
D |
CB |
D |
LS |
D- |
KRB |
D |
FB |
D |
TE |
D- |
OLB |
D |
H |
D |
HT |
D+ |
KOS |
C- |
|
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
FGM |
FGA |
PCT |
LNG |
LNGA |
1-19 |
20-29 |
30-39 |
40-49 |
50+ |
XPM |
XPA |
PCT |
1978 |
WIN |
1 |
1 |
2 |
3 |
66.7 |
32 |
47 |
0-0 |
1-1 |
1-1 |
0-1 |
0-0 |
1 |
1 |
100.0 |
1983 |
NYN |
12 |
12 |
22 |
25 |
88.0 |
51 |
51 |
1-1 |
5-5 |
9-11 |
6-7 |
1-1 |
26 |
27 |
96.3 |
1984 |
NYN |
16 |
16 |
19 |
21 |
90.5 |
52 |
56 |
1-1 |
6-6 |
4-4 |
7-8 |
1-2 |
27 |
27 |
100.0 |
1985 |
NYN |
16 |
16 |
17 |
19 |
89.5 |
46 |
46 |
1-1 |
5-5 |
7-7 |
4-6 |
0-0 |
23 |
23 |
100.0 |
1986 |
NYN |
16 |
16 |
22 |
24 |
91.7 |
49 |
49 |
2-2 |
7-7 |
5-5 |
8-10 |
0-0 |
34 |
34 |
100.0 |
1987 |
NYN |
16 |
16 |
21 |
24 |
87.5 |
48 |
48 |
0-0 |
8-10 |
7-7 |
6-7 |
0-0 |
29 |
31 |
93.5 |
1988 |
NYN |
14 |
14 |
17 |
19 |
89.5 |
49 |
49 |
1-2 |
6-6 |
5-5 |
5-6 |
0-0 |
23 |
24 |
95.8 |
1989 |
MIA |
16 |
16 |
20 |
22 |
90.9 |
50 |
50 |
3-3 |
3-3 |
5-6 |
7-8 |
2-2 |
33 |
33 |
100.0 |
1990 |
MIA |
16 |
16 |
26 |
26 |
100.0 |
47 |
47 |
0-0 |
9-9 |
6-6 |
11-11 |
0-0 |
21 |
22 |
95.5 |
1991 |
MIA |
16 |
16 |
25 |
26 |
96.2 |
49 |
49 |
0-0 |
8-8 |
8-9 |
9-9 |
0-0 |
19 |
19 |
100.0 |
Total |
|
139 |
139 |
191 |
209 |
91.4 |
52 |
56 |
9-10 |
58-60 |
57-61 |
63-73 |
4-5 |
236 |
241 |
97.9 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1992 | Zeke Buksar has retired from the Miami Stingrays. |
09-25-1983 | The New York Hardcore have moved Zeke Buksar to the active roster. The New York Hardcore have moved Robert Campbell to the inactive roster. |
09-25-1983 | The New York Hardcore have acquired Zeke Buksar from the waiver wire. |
08-23-1982 | The Washington Xenomorphs have waived Zeke Buksar. |
05-02-1982 | The Washington Xenomorphs have acquired Zeke Buksar from the waiver wire. |
08-24-1981 | The Washington Xenomorphs have waived Zeke Buksar. |
08-10-1981 | The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Zeke Buksar, Clark Weary, Raymond Rose, and Billy Barber to the active roster. The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Buchanan Barnes, Tom Tobin, Joe Mostardo, and Anthony Traynowicz to the inactive roster. |
08-10-1981 | The Washington Xenomorphs have acquired Zeke Buksar from the waiver wire. |
08-18-1980 | The Washington Xenomorphs have waived Zeke Buksar. |
08-17-1980 | The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Bill Nichols, Mark Ellis, John Briggs, Chase Jackson, George Barnes, Bob Goebel, Al Bailey, Tyrus Lee, Joe Stewart, Dale Harvin, Ken Williams, Joe Mostardo, Reggie Rambo, Eric Fellows, Kurt Saunooke, Terry Mitchell, Hessley Brigance, Lakei Woodbury, A.B. Blackwell, Anthony Traynowicz, Chad McKalip, Shawn Sanders, and Al Cowne to the active roster. The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Zeke Buksar, Lorenzo Bethune, Drew Mincy, Jarvis Mark, Tom Tobin, Dee Johnson, Aaron Bracken, John Rodgers, Gene Atkins, Byron Reifsnyder, Tom Cook, John McPhee, Stan Tuiasosopo, Steve Walker, Pat Peets, Chief Williams, Nathan Harlow, Shawn Bostic, Hugh Darnall, M.L. Wiley, Byron Diggs, Larry Franklin, and Keith McGriff to the inactive roster. |
08-04-1980 | The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Zeke Buksar to the active roster. The Washington Xenomorphs have moved Joe Mostardo to the inactive roster. |
04-27-1980 | The Washington Xenomorphs have acquired Zeke Buksar from the waiver wire. |
09-11-1978 | The Winnipeg Starriors have waived Zeke Buksar. |
08-20-1978 | The Winnipeg Starriors have moved Zeke Buksar to the active roster. The Winnipeg Starriors have moved Jim Bates to the inactive roster. |
08-20-1978 | The Winnipeg Starriors have acquired Zeke Buksar from the waiver wire. |
08-14-1977 | The Providence Heretics have waived Zeke Buksar. |