BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (01-07-2021) |
Potential |
A |
Age at Death |
66
|
Born |
03-18-1954 in Irving, TX |
Drafted |
Round 7, Pick 216 (1977) |
Experience |
1 Year (21 Wks) |
College |
Colorado University Boulder, 1977 |
Salary |
385 ($2603.278M/2135 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D- |
Catching |
B+ |
Pass Cover |
D |
Kick Power |
D- |
Throw Acc |
D |
Pass Blocking |
B- |
Run Cover |
D+ |
Kick Acc |
D- |
Carrying |
C |
Run Blocking |
B- |
Tackling |
C |
Kick Return |
D |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
F |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
B- |
Stamina |
B+ |
Execution |
B- |
Agility |
B- |
Strength |
B- |
Health |
C+ |
Aggressiveness |
B |
Hands |
C |
Jumping |
C+ |
|
|
Attitude |
C- |
Break Tackle |
D+ |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
C- |
DT |
C |
SS |
C- |
K |
F |
GUN |
B- |
WR |
C+ |
G |
C |
DE |
C- |
FS |
C- |
P |
F |
KR |
C- |
HB/TB |
C- |
T |
C |
ILB |
C- |
CB |
C |
LS |
D |
KRB |
C |
FB |
C |
TE |
B |
OLB |
C |
H |
D |
HT |
B- |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
TARG |
REC |
PCT |
YDS |
AVG |
LNG |
YAC |
YACA |
TD |
YDS/G |
1ST |
1ST% |
DP |
1977 |
LV |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
Total |
|
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
-- |
0 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1982 | Ephraim Stallings has retired from football. |
09-04-1978 | The Las Vegas Sinners have waived Ephraim Stallings. |
09-04-1978 | The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Hugo Stiglitz, Buddy Morrow, Burton Hill, Paul Zarate, Tim Lassiter, Wario Cousins, Jamie Whitted, Jack Blackfyre, and Johnny Osika to the active roster. The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Kantroy Dusbabek, Chuck Brown, Ephraim Stallings, Robert Edwards, and P.J. Bender to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1978 | The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Cas McQuilken, Ephraim Stallings, Karl Belton, Earl Burnett, Al Lamer, Kantroy Dusbabek, Kenny Brooks, Travis Adams, Dou Kasper, Chuck Brown, and Don St.Clair to the active roster. The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Tim Lassiter, Streetlamp Le Moose, Garrett Winter, Gene Hill, Ramon Coyote, Jack Blackfyre, Reggie Hardison, Hugo Stiglitz, Troy Barber, Johnny Osika, Ed Gaines, Wario Cousins, George Krueger, Burton Hill, and Grady Jankowski to the inactive roster. |
12-12-1977 | The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Nathan Bennet to the active roster. The Las Vegas Sinners have moved Ephraim Stallings to the inactive roster. |
08-08-1977 | The Las Vegas Sinners have moved P.J. Bender, Lamont Porell, Streetlamp Le Moose, Ephraim Stallings, Terry Terrell, Kantroy Dusbabek, Hugh Young, Bob Moss, Dwayne Reed, Don Melinkovich, Keith Cryder, and Jon Berry to the active roster. The Las Vegas Sinners have moved William Mendizabal, K.W. Bagby, Gene Hill, Ramon Coyote, Reggie Hardison, Hugo Stiglitz, Troy Barber, Johnny Osika, Bing Horn, Wario Cousins, George Krueger, Burton Hill, Grady Jankowski, Charley Widmore, Walter Scott, and Shawn Roday to the inactive roster. |