BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Retired (1989) |
Potential |
A+ |
Age |
58
|
Born |
01-01-1955 in Moline, IL |
Drafted |
Round 5, Pick 114 (1977) |
Experience |
9 Years (179 Wks) |
College |
College of Texas, 1977 |
Salary |
745 ($985K/2013 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D+ |
Catching |
C- |
Pass Cover |
F |
Kick Power |
F |
Throw Acc |
D |
Pass Blocking |
D+ |
Run Cover |
C+ |
Kick Acc |
D |
Carrying |
C- |
Run Blocking |
C- |
Tackling |
B- |
Kick Return |
F |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
C |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
C- |
Stamina |
C+ |
Execution |
C+ |
Agility |
C |
Strength |
B |
Health |
D |
Aggressiveness |
C- |
Hands |
C |
Jumping |
C- |
|
|
Attitude |
A+ |
Break Tackle |
D |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
D+ |
DT |
B- |
SS |
C- |
K |
F |
GUN |
C |
WR |
D |
G |
C- |
DE |
C |
FS |
D+ |
P |
F |
KR |
D+ |
HB/TB |
D+ |
T |
D+ |
ILB |
C+ |
CB |
D+ |
LS |
D |
KRB |
D+ |
FB |
D+ |
TE |
D+ |
OLB |
C |
H |
D |
HT |
C |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year | Type | QB | RB | WR | TE | C | G | T | DT | DE | LB | CB | S | K | P | ST |
1977 | Game | | | | | | | | 141.3 | 21.5 | | | | | | |
1978 | Game | | | | | | | | 39.5 | 10.3 | | | | | | |
1979 | Game | | | | | | | | 379.6 | 22.6 | | | | | | |
1980 | Game | | | | | | | | 370.2 | 28.3 | | | | | | |
1982 | Game | | | | | | | | 70.2 | 44.4 | | | | | | |
1983 | Game | | | | | | | | 215.3 | 47.2 | | | | | | |
1984 | Game | | | | | | | | 162.1 | 40.2 | | | | | | |
1985 | Game | | | | | | | | 175.5 | 32.9 | | | | | | |
1986 | Game | | | | | | | | 295.6 | 36.9 | | | | | | |
1987 | Game | | | | | | | | 191.8 | 48.7 | | | | | | |
1988 | Game | | | | | | | | 17.9 | 2.8 | | | | | | |
Numbers in this table represent the number of minutes played at each position. ST represents special teams positions other than K or P.
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1990 | Clint Suchy has retired from football. |
08-14-1988 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have waived Clint Suchy. |
08-14-1988 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Stan Sullins, Herman Hudson, Ken Cook, and George Wallace to the active roster. The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Winston Perry, John Krakau, and Clint Suchy to the inactive roster. |
10-04-1982 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Clint Suchy to the active roster. |
08-10-1981 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Martin Webb, Lee Fullington, and Poel Tharp to the active roster. The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Don Danehe, Clint Suchy, and Roscoe Williams to the inactive roster. |
11-26-1978 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Clint Suchy to the active roster. The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Hal Hill to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1978 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Edgar Brock, Elijah Lalonde, Byron Saidock, Mark Harrington, and Chris Evans to the active roster. The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Kevin Smith, Jug Lincoln, Greg Bradford, and Clint Suchy to the inactive roster. |
08-14-1977 | The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Richard Bradley, Jack Rogers, Al Maves, Bubba Anderson, Bill Davis, and Clint Suchy to the active roster. The Brooklyn BadBoys have moved Kwamie Williams, Elijah Lalonde, Greg Bradford, Ernie Jones, Chuck Grossman, and Conrad Doss to the inactive roster. |