Date | Transaction |
02-28-2015 | Jean Levesque has retired from football. |
09-08-2013 | The Green Bay Ice have waived Jean Levesque. |
09-02-2013 | The Green Bay Ice have moved Jean Levesque to the active roster. |
08-05-2013 | The Green Bay Ice have moved Joel Wilson to the active roster. The Green Bay Ice have moved Jean Levesque to the inactive roster. |
09-10-2012 | The Green Bay Ice have acquired Jean Levesque from the waiver wire. |
09-03-2012 | The Edmonton Rebel Alliance have waived Jean Levesque. |
01-22-2012 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Leia Organa, Quinlan Vos, and Jyn Erso to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Ben Crowe, Rey, Depa Billable, Pancake Turner, Jean Levesque, Jack Hempel, and Qui Gon Jinn to the inactive roster. |
09-04-2011 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Depa Billable, Captain Panaka, Ben Crowe, Yoda, Jean Levesque, Travis Williams, Rey, Mace Windu, and Qui Gon Jinn to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Jim Post, Mike Johnson, George Jacobs, Curley Russell, Bob Britt, and Leia Organa to the inactive roster. |
05-01-2011 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Joe Kinderdine, Terry Bennett, Nathan Holman, Chirrut Imwe, Leia Organa, Lando Calrissian, Curley Russell, Mike Graham, Jar Jar Binks, Nat Jones, George Jacobs, and Saw Gerrera to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Rex Dexter, Ki-Adi Mundi, Luke Skywalker, Julian Wise, Rey, Captain Panaka, Jean Levesque, Dick Bowman, Cassian Andor, Poe Dameron, Anakin Skywalker, Orome, and C Three PO to the inactive roster. |
01-03-2011 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Poe Dameron, Rey, Orome, Mace Windu, Jean Levesque, and Cassian Andor to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Biggs Darklighter, Saw Gerrera, Lando Calrissian, Leia Organa, Jar Jar Binks, and Kanan Jarrus to the inactive roster. |
12-26-2010 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Saw Gerrera, Chirrut Imwe, Jyn Erso, Leia Organa, Jar Jar Binks, and Chewbacca to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved C Three PO, Poe Dameron, Rey, Luke Skywalker, Jean Levesque, and Cassian Andor to the inactive roster. |
09-05-2010 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Orome, Jean Levesque, Admiral Ackbar, Mace Windu, and Bodhi Rook to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Lando Calrissian and Leia Organa to the inactive roster. |
08-09-2010 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Cedric Parker, Ben McLaughlin, Bob Hanburger, Lando Calrissian, Tyrone Fischer, and George Jacobs to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Ben Crowe, Rey, Depa Billable, Captain Panaka, Jean Levesque, Orome, and Yoda to the inactive roster. |
01-03-2010 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Depa Billable, Ki-Adi Mundi, Yoda, Jean Levesque, Del Scoggins, Pancake Turner, Rey, Luke Skywalker, Harrison Kind, Julian Wise, Mace Windu, Manwe, and C Three PO to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Lando Calrissian, K Two SO, Clarence Henley, Chirrut Imwe, Jim Solwold, Jyn Erso, Saw Gerrera, and Chewbacca to the inactive roster. |
12-27-2009 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Jyn Erso, Clarence Henley, Chirrut Imwe, Chewbacca, Lando Calrissian, Saw Gerrera, and K Two SO to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Ki-Adi Mundi, Luke Skywalker, Harrison Kind, Julian Wise, Rey, Jean Levesque, Mace Windu, Poe Dameron, Manwe, C Three PO, and Yoda to the inactive roster. |
09-06-2009 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Ben Crowe, Rey, Depa Billable, Captain Panaka, Jean Levesque, Mace Windu, Jack Hempel, and Qui Gon Jinn to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Lando Calrissian, Sid Satenstein, and Raymond Rice to the inactive roster. |
05-03-2009 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Kevin Shaw, Steve Flowers, Sid Satenstein, Raymond Rice, and Marco Kinney to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Ben Crowe, Rey, Depa Billable, Kay Howard, Jean Levesque, Mace Windu, and Orome to the inactive roster. |
02-07-2005 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Jean Levesque to the active roster. The Norfolk Jedi have moved Obi-Wan Kenobi to the inactive roster. |
01-10-2005 | The Norfolk Jedi have moved Jean Levesque to the inactive roster. |
01-10-2005 | Trade #61778 has been completed between the Washington Capitolists and the Norfolk Jedi. The Norfolk Jedi receive Jean Levesque (QB) from the Washington Capitolists in exchange for Draft Pick - 2005 Round 3 (NOR). |
11-28-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Jean Levesque on the trade block. |
10-18-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean Levesque to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Stud Stauch to the inactive roster. |
10-18-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Stud Stauch to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean Levesque to the inactive roster. |
10-18-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Jean Levesque from the trade block. |
09-06-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Jean Levesque on the trade block. |
08-30-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have changed JL Levesque's name to Jean Levesque. |
08-30-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have changed J.L. Levesque's name to JL Levesque. |
08-30-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean Levesque's name to J.L. Levesque. |
08-30-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Jean Levesque from the trade block. |
08-09-2004 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Jean Levesque on the trade block. |
08-11-2003 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean-Luc Levesque's name to Jean Levesque. |
01-13-2003 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean-Luc Levesque to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Sid Malicous to the inactive roster. |
01-13-2003 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Perry Steiner, Bob Lindsey, and Heinrich Fischer to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean-Luc Levesque, Tom Reuter, and Jesse Cartwright to the inactive roster. |
09-30-2002 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean-Luc Levesque to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Reggie Overmyer to the inactive roster. |
09-30-2002 | The Washington Capitolists have acquired Jean-Luc Levesque from the waiver wire. |
09-30-2002 | The Washington Capitolists have waived Jean-Luc Levesque. |
05-02-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean Levesque's name to Jean-Luc Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean-Luc Levesque's name to Jean Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean Levesque's name to Jean-Luc Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "Belle Mort" Levesque's name to Jean Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "La Belle Mort" Levesque's name to Jean "Belle Mort" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "Couronne" Levesque's name to Jean "La Belle Mort" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "La Couronne" Levesque's name to Jean "Couronne" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "L'heritier" Levesque's name to Jean "La Couronne" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "L'héritier" Levesque's name to Jean "L'heritier" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "Imparfaite Avenir" Levesque's name to Jean "L'héritier" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean "La Couronne" Levesque's name to Jean "Imparfaite Avenir" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Jean Levesque's name to Jean "La Couronne" Levesque. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Jean Levesque to the active roster. |
08-10-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Regan Way's name to Jean Levesque. |