BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Retired (2089) |
Potential |
A |
Age |
59
|
Born |
04-10-2057 in Quincy, MA |
Drafted |
Round 7, Pick 204 (2079) |
Experience |
0 Years (7 Wks) |
College |
Merrimack University, 2079 |
Salary |
310 ($554.463M/2116 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D+ |
Catching |
C |
Pass Cover |
C |
Kick Power |
D |
Throw Acc |
D+ |
Pass Blocking |
C- |
Run Cover |
B- |
Kick Acc |
D+ |
Carrying |
D |
Run Blocking |
B- |
Tackling |
B- |
Kick Return |
F |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
B+ |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
B- |
Stamina |
B- |
Execution |
C+ |
Agility |
B |
Strength |
A- |
Health |
B |
Aggressiveness |
B |
Hands |
C+ |
Jumping |
D+ |
|
|
Attitude |
A- |
Break Tackle |
B- |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
C- |
DT |
B- |
SS |
C+ |
K |
F |
GUN |
C+ |
WR |
C- |
G |
C |
DE |
B- |
FS |
C+ |
P |
D- |
KR |
C- |
HB/TB |
C- |
T |
C+ |
ILB |
B- |
CB |
C |
LS |
D+ |
KRB |
C |
FB |
C |
TE |
C |
OLB |
B- |
H |
D+ |
HT |
C |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
TKL |
SOLO |
AST |
SACK |
SAF |
STF |
DEF |
BRK |
INT |
INTY |
AVG |
LNG |
TD |
FF |
2081 |
PHI |
3 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
Total |
|
3 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
09-04-2084 | The San Antonio Cavalry have moved Dwight Owens to the active roster. The San Antonio Cavalry have moved Carl Gibbs to the inactive roster. |
09-04-2084 | The San Antonio Cavalry have waived Joey Motley. |
01-03-2084 | The San Antonio Cavalry have acquired Joey Motley from the waiver wire. |
09-14-2082 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Cato Zawadzkas to the active roster. |
09-14-2082 | The Philadelphia Federalists have waived Joey Motley. |
08-24-2082 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Chad Hammond, Desmond Jones, Andre Fairchild, Trey Romasko, Booker Conners, Al McCormick, Hal Ilkin, Calvin Glass, and Peter Kowalski to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Maurice Pompetus-O'love, Dan Churchman, John Binotto, Gil Gaines, Donnie Ellis, Kevin Lusby, Doc Didier, Roy Brennan, and Joey Motley to the inactive roster. |
11-30-2081 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Ralph Bryan, Donnie Ellis, Chuck Thomas, Walt Burress, and Joey Motley to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Ralph Roberts, Peter Kowalski, Andre Fairchild, Zatcher Minkey, and Al McCormick to the inactive roster. |
08-25-2081 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Al McCormick, Andre Fairchild, Vin Colvin, and Larry Scott to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Kenny Von Sonn, Kevin Lusby, Walt Burress, and Joey Motley to the inactive roster. |
08-18-2081 | The Philadelphia Federalists have acquired Joey Motley from the waiver wire. |
09-08-2080 | The Memphis Bulldogs have automatically waived Joey Motley to comply with the 53-man roster limit. |