BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Retired (2085) |
Potential |
D+ |
Age |
65
|
Born |
11-26-2051 in Oswego, IL |
Drafted |
Round 5, Pick 129 (2074) |
Experience |
8 Years (175 Wks) |
College |
Maryland College, 2074 |
Salary |
745 ($1332.5M/2116 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D- |
Catching |
D+ |
Pass Cover |
D+ |
Kick Power |
F |
Throw Acc |
D |
Pass Blocking |
D |
Run Cover |
C+ |
Kick Acc |
C- |
Carrying |
D+ |
Run Blocking |
D+ |
Tackling |
B- |
Kick Return |
F |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
C |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
C+ |
Stamina |
C+ |
Execution |
B |
Agility |
B- |
Strength |
B |
Health |
D+ |
Aggressiveness |
D |
Hands |
C |
Jumping |
C+ |
|
|
Attitude |
A |
Break Tackle |
F |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
D+ |
DT |
C+ |
SS |
C |
K |
F |
GUN |
C |
WR |
D+ |
G |
C- |
DE |
C |
FS |
C- |
P |
F |
KR |
D+ |
HB/TB |
D+ |
T |
C- |
ILB |
B- |
CB |
C |
LS |
D |
KRB |
D+ |
FB |
D+ |
TE |
D+ |
OLB |
B- |
H |
D+ |
HT |
C |
KOS |
D- |
|
Notes: |
Sim Bowl CXXII Champion |
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
TKL |
SOLO |
AST |
SACK |
SAF |
STF |
DEF |
BRK |
INT |
INTY |
AVG |
LNG |
TD |
FF |
2074 |
WAS |
12 |
12 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
3 |
3 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
1 |
2075 |
WAS |
16 |
15 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
2 |
1 |
1 |
14 |
14.0 |
14 |
0 |
2 |
2076 |
WAS |
16 |
4 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2077 |
WAS |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2078 |
WAS |
14 |
2 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2079 |
WAS |
15 |
3 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
1 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
1 |
2080 |
WAS |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2081 |
WAS |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2083 |
WAS |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
Total |
|
122 |
36 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
6 |
5 |
1 |
14 |
14.0 |
14 |
0 |
4 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2086 | Greg Hampton has retired from football. |
10-18-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Glen Asher to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Johnie Akin to the inactive roster. |
10-18-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have waived Greg Hampton. |
10-03-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Hampton to the inactive roster. |
09-13-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Hampton to the active roster. |
09-13-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Adewale Marchiol, Jon Donnelly, Dave Hooker, Ken Blakely, Ray Heller, John Dorsey, Jeff Sullins, Nirvana Crowley, John Ray, John Mahan, Kyle Vesuvius, Brad Grant, and Bill McCallum to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Ted Myles, Pete Wynne, Jack Beck, Greg Hampton, Shawn Mills, Oscar Avezzano, Menil Marderian, Joe Sagapolutele, and Gary Ziegler to the inactive roster. |
08-09-2083 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Joe Sagapolutele, Jack Beck, Harold Ellzey, Greg Hampton, Johnie Akin, Oscar Avezzano, Menil Marderian, and Pete Wynne to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Dave Hooker, Ken Blakely, Adewale Marchiol, John Dorsey, Kyle Vesuvius, Nirvana Crowley, John Ray, Jeff Sullins, and John Mahan to the inactive roster. |
09-06-2082 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Dave Hooker, Ken Blakely, Adewale Marchiol, Thom Haley, John Dorsey, Kyle Vesuvius, Bill McCallum, Nirvana Crowley, John Ray, Tony Hillebrand, Jon Donnelly, Jeff Sullins, and John Mahan to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Joe Sagapolutele, James Williams, Harold Ellzey, Greg Hampton, Arthur Phillips, Cris Earl, Oscar Avezzano, and Menil Marderian to the inactive roster. |
09-29-2075 | Greg Hampton of the Washington Capitolists is injured with a leg contusion and is expected to be out for approximately 7 days. |
09-30-2074 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Bill Hammond, Greg Hampton, and Emery Stone to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Chance Ramsey, Jamie Julian, and Michael Wynne to the inactive roster. |