Date | Transaction |
02-28-2002 | Teddy Mayberry has retired from football. |
09-12-1999 | The Winnipeg Jets have automatically waived Teddy Mayberry to comply with the 53-man roster limit. |
08-09-1999 | The Winnipeg Jets have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
01-24-1999 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Dick Roman, Ted Cooper, Benji Soong, George Reece, Roy Absher, Joe Cunningham, Dale Nelson, Brad Lohmeyer, and Duane Melville to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Matt Barnes, Ross Moore, Dick Plunkett, Art Robinson, Teddy Mayberry, Ron Collier, Pat Mitchell, Garry Cooke, Tommy Vedder, Don Anderson, and Bill Nixon to the inactive roster. |
09-06-1998 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Garry Cooke, Ron Collier, Don Favre, Matt Barnes, John Bertelsen, Dick Plunkett, Ross Moore, Art Robinson, Don Anderson, and Teddy Mayberry to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Lindon Busby, Ray Steele, Ted Cooper, Brad Lohmeyer, and Dick Gallegos to the inactive roster. |
12-07-1997 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Paul Butler, Lindon Busby, and Garry Cooke to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ishmael Levinson, Teddy Mayberry, and Duane Melville to the inactive roster. |
10-26-1997 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ishmael Levinson and Teddy Mayberry to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved George Reece to the inactive roster. |
10-26-1997 | Trade #55935 has been completed between the Washington Capitolists and the Winnipeg Jets. The Winnipeg Jets receive Ishmael Levinson (S), Benji Soong (G), Teddy Mayberry (G), Draft Pick - 1998 Round 4 (CLE), Draft Pick - 1998 Round 3 (LOU) from the Washington Capitolists in exchange for Craig Laurinaitis (C). |
10-06-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
10-05-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Teddy Mayberry to the inactive roster. |
08-10-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Teddy Mayberry from the trade block. |
04-27-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Teddy Mayberry to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Peter Praxis and Judah "The Lion" Fidel to the inactive roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Benji Soong, Jack Handey, and Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie, Teddy Mayberry, and Ken Belanger to the inactive roster. |
10-14-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Teddy Mayberry from the trade block. |
10-07-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
09-22-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Teddy Mayberry from the trade block. |
09-22-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
09-22-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
09-16-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Teddy Mayberry from the trade block. |
09-16-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Teddy Mayberry on the trade block. |
09-05-1994 | The Washington Captiolists have moved Jermaine Morris, Ray Brunson, Joe Ware, Steve Hardison, Tom Silvers, Chuck Bumgardner, Tom Marvel, Rickey McDaniel, Luke "Lucky" Gamble, Rob Constantine, Nolan Creed, Judah "The Lion" Fidel, Greg Lewis, Joe Rosenfels, Alphonso "The Grey" Elric, Hans Heidenreich, Tommy Bregel, Teddy Mayberry, Ken Belanger, Matthew Madison, Paul Erie, Chris Miranoi, Billy Doink, Reuben Carson, and Matthias Black to the active roster. The Washington Captiolists have moved Darren "Double D" Dreamer, John Monroe, Reilly Johnson, and Gene Percy to the inactive roster. |
08-08-1994 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Teddy Mayberry, Joe Ware, Chuck Bumgardner, and Matthias Black to the inactive roster. |
08-23-1993 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Teddy Mayberry to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Matthew Madison to the inactive roster. |
08-23-1993 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Teddy Mayberry to the inactive roster. |
08-22-1993 | Teddy Mayberry of the Washington Capitolists is injured with an ankle ligament sprain and is expected to be out for approximately 21 days. |
04-28-1991 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Carl Mayberry's name to Teddy Mayberry. |
01-13-1991 | Trade #49398 has been completed between the Los Angeles Capitolists and the San Jose Pirates. The San Jose Pirates receive Cecil Weaver (G), Thad Thompson (WR), John Davis (WR) from the Los Angeles Capitolists in exchange for Carl Mayberry (G), Keith Lomack (RB). |
09-02-1990 | The San Jose Pirates have moved Carl Mayberry to the active roster. The San Jose Pirates have moved Jeff Yarborough to the inactive roster. |
11-20-1989 | The Phoenix Reapers have moved Danny Reaves to the active roster. The Phoenix Reapers have moved Carl Mayberry to the inactive roster. |
08-28-1989 | The Phoenix Reapers have moved Carl Mayberry to the active roster. The Phoenix Reapers have moved Tony Maness to the inactive roster. |
08-21-1989 | The Phoenix Reapers have moved Bill Ostendarp to the active roster. The Phoenix Reapers have moved Carl Mayberry to the inactive roster. |
08-20-1989 | Carl Mayberry of the Phoenix Reapers is injured with a hip contusion and is expected to be out for approximately 4 days. |
08-07-1989 | The Phoenix Reapers have moved Carl Mayberry to the active roster. The Phoenix Reapers have moved Ken Johnson and John Harbinson to the inactive roster. |