BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (02-12-2043) |
Potential |
B+ |
Age at Death |
69
|
Born |
03-27-1973 in Carrizo Springs, TX |
Drafted |
Round 6, Pick 189 (1996) |
Experience |
8 Years (178 Wks) |
College |
Oregon University, 1996 |
Salary |
745 ($5037.513M/2135 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D- |
Catching |
D |
Pass Cover |
F |
Kick Power |
D+ |
Throw Acc |
D |
Pass Blocking |
C- |
Run Cover |
C+ |
Kick Acc |
F |
Carrying |
D+ |
Run Blocking |
B- |
Tackling |
A- |
Kick Return |
D- |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
C+ |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
C- |
Stamina |
C- |
Execution |
D+ |
Agility |
C+ |
Strength |
B+ |
Health |
C |
Aggressiveness |
B- |
Hands |
C- |
Jumping |
C+ |
|
|
Attitude |
B+ |
Break Tackle |
D |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
C- |
DT |
B- |
SS |
C |
K |
F |
GUN |
C |
WR |
D+ |
G |
C |
DE |
C+ |
FS |
C- |
P |
F |
KR |
D |
HB/TB |
D+ |
T |
C |
ILB |
C+ |
CB |
C- |
LS |
D |
KRB |
C- |
FB |
C- |
TE |
C- |
OLB |
C+ |
H |
D- |
HT |
D+ |
KOS |
F |
|
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
TKL |
SOLO |
AST |
SACK |
SAF |
STF |
DEF |
BRK |
INT |
INTY |
AVG |
LNG |
TD |
FF |
1996 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1997 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1998 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1999 |
BUF |
15 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2000 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2001 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2002 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2003 |
BUF |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2004 |
BUF |
4 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
Total |
|
131 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2005 | Ken Bruggers has retired from the Buffalo Bootleggers. |
01-03-2005 | The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Bret Hart to the active roster. The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Ken Bruggers to the inactive roster. |
12-27-2004 | The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Ken Bruggers to the active roster. The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Jon Fritz to the inactive roster. |
09-26-2004 | The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Merwin Miller to the active roster. The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Ken Bruggers to the inactive roster. |
08-05-1996 | The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Randy Harmon, Doyle Jones, Jack Fortin, Don Bebee, Ken Bruggers, Ned Hohman, Donnell Whitman, and Mel Dutton to the active roster. The Buffalo Bootleggers have moved Javor Killorin, Darrell Nonnemaker, Tim Brown, Brad Lane, Don Brennan, Bill Smith, Bruce Smith, and John McLeod to the inactive roster. |