BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
51
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (01-07-2020) |
Potential |
47 |
Age at Death |
73
|
Born |
07-03-1946 in Clinton, OK |
Drafted |
Round 5, Pick 79 (1969) |
Experience |
9 Years (175 Wks) |
College |
Technical University of Florida, 1969 |
Salary |
745 ($115.016M/2081 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
21 |
Catching |
10 |
Pass Cover |
36 |
Kick Power |
13 |
Throw Acc |
6 |
Pass Blocking |
31 |
Run Cover |
59 |
Kick Acc |
29 |
Carrying |
37 |
Run Blocking |
1 |
Tackling |
56 |
Kick Return |
7 |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
56 |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
47 |
Stamina |
12 |
Execution |
47 |
Agility |
70 |
Strength |
45 |
Health |
14 |
Aggressiveness |
17 |
Hands |
49 |
Jumping |
49 |
|
|
Attitude |
81 |
Break Tackle |
30 |
ROLES |
QB |
21 |
C |
22 |
DT |
45 |
SS |
45 |
K |
1 |
GUN |
42 |
WR |
30 |
G |
28 |
DE |
51 |
FS |
40 |
P |
4 |
KR |
28 |
HB/TB |
31 |
T |
30 |
ILB |
47 |
CB |
41 |
LS |
12 |
KRB |
26 |
FB |
27 |
TE |
23 |
OLB |
47 |
H |
23 |
HT |
33 |
KOS |
7 |
|
Year |
Team |
G |
GS |
TKL |
SOLO |
AST |
SACK |
SAF |
STF |
DEF |
BRK |
INT |
INTY |
AVG |
LNG |
TD |
FF |
1969 |
CHI |
3 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1970 |
GB |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1971 |
GB |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1972 |
GB |
6 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1973 |
GB |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
10.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
4 |
1974 |
GB |
16 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
4.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1975 |
GB |
13 |
1 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
5.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1976 |
GB |
16 |
4 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
4.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
1 |
1977 |
GB |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
0 |
1978 |
GB |
16 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
2.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
1 |
Total |
|
134 |
6 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
25.0 |
0 |
0.0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
0 |
-- |
0 |
0 |
6 |
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1980 | Roy Stoyanovich has retired from football. |
04-29-1979 | The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have waived Roy Stoyanovich. |
11-23-1975 | Roy Stoyanovich of the Green Bay Scorpion Kings is injured with a knee derangement and is expected to be out for approximately 28 days. |
08-06-1973 | The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Roy Stoyanovich, Mike Smith, John Osley, and Ralph Smith to the active roster. The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Dirt Chukwurah, Reggie Lansford, Garland Mangum, and Brett Ware to the inactive roster. |
10-23-1972 | The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Brett Ware to the active roster. The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Roy Stoyanovich to the inactive roster. |
08-16-1970 | The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Roy Stoyanovich to the active roster. The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have moved Courtney Gleason to the inactive roster. |
05-03-1970 | The Green Bay Scorpion Kings have acquired Roy Stoyanovich from the waiver wire. |
09-22-1969 | The Chicago Bears have waived Roy Stoyanovich. |
08-10-1969 | The Chicago Bears have moved Roy Stoyanovich, Paul Barnes, Greg Wright, Scott Edwards, Chuck Fox, John Mikeska, Jim Harrison, Art Young, Jim Owens, Eddie Hennings, Roger Shaw, Randy Oliver, and Brian Hanson to the active roster. The Chicago Bears have moved Mike Sturgis, Bo Johnson, Dean Carpenter, Josh Roman, George Tillison, Benny Henry, Bill Edwards, Curley Reeder, Lavon Cichowski, Brett Sutter, John Kellogg, Lloyd Petersen, and Damon Bowman to the inactive roster. |