Numbers in this table represent the number of minutes played at each position. ST represents special teams positions other than K or P.
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2079 | Bob Wooden has retired from football. |
08-10-2076 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have waived Bob Wooden. |
12-29-2075 | Bob Wooden of the Birmingham Bridgeburners is injured with a hip contusion and is expected to be out for approximately 8 days. |
08-20-2073 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have removed Bob Wooden from the trade block. |
01-22-2073 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have placed Bob Wooden on the trade block. |
09-04-2072 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Johnny Rison, Tom Cornish, Sticks Hickman, Bob Wooden, Slim Charles, Izzy Barnes, Joe Zukauskas, Bucky Wingo, David Eliopulos, Harold Ramis, Merlin Blaylock, and Ricky Bredde to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Louis McCusker, Floyd Johnson, Fred Bredde, Jesse Andrews, Jesse Mostardo, and Travis Matthews to the inactive roster. |
05-01-2072 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Fred Bredde, Cliff Yelverton, Quick Ben, Travis Matthews, and Kenny Smith to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bob Wooden, Sticks Hickman, Slim Charles, and Harold Ramis to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2071 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bill Tepe, Bernie Roe, Max Burnette, Bob Wooden, Merlin Blaylock, Sticks Hickman, Izzy Barnes, Charlie Mason, Slim Charles, Ropes Dingleberry, Harold Ramis, and Mike Vick to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Brick Dittman, Jack Graddy, Travis Matthews, George Davis, Max Tharpe, Jesse Mostardo, and Kenny Smith to the inactive roster. |
05-03-2071 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Boss Powell, Cliff Yelverton, Jack Graddy, Travis Matthews, George Davis, Dwayne Nairan, Jesse Mostardo, and Kenny Smith to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bill Tepe, Bernie Roe, Steve Coleman, Bob Wooden, Merlin Blaylock, Sean Uhrinyak, Izzy Barnes, Charlie Mason, Slim Charles, Harold Ramis, and Mike Vick to the inactive roster. |
12-28-2070 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have removed Bob Wooden from the trade block. |
11-16-2070 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have placed Bob Wooden on the trade block. |
12-23-2068 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bob Wooden to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Colonel Cline to the inactive roster. |
12-23-2068 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Zebulon Bishop to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bob Wooden to the inactive roster. |
10-07-2068 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bob Wooden to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Colonel Cline to the inactive roster. |
09-02-2068 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bob Wooden to the inactive roster. |
04-29-2068 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Bucky Wingo, Garrett Abrams, Jack Edwards, Wilbert Greeley, Bob Wooden, Babe Spragan, Weldon West, and Terry Kroll to the active roster. The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved Donelli Donelli, Brick Dittman, Mike Mueller, Bobby "Thriller" Miller, Xavier Green, Bill Atkinson, and Mike Vick to the inactive roster. |
12-11-2067 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have reverted U. Wooden's name to Bob Wooden. |
09-05-2067 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have moved U. Wooden to the inactive roster. |
09-05-2067 | The Birmingham Bridgeburners have acquired U. Wooden from the waiver wire. |
08-29-2067 | The Omaha Oozen Oz have waived U. Wooden. |
08-29-2067 | The Omaha Oozen Oz have moved Barry Gladiator, Wyatt Matta, Dickie Hertzer, and Glitter Dunn to the active roster. The Omaha Oozen Oz have moved Jacques Hitch, U. Wooden, and Barry "Red" Garnett to the inactive roster. |
08-08-2067 | The Omaha Oozen Oz have changed Bob Wooden's name to U. Wooden. |
08-08-2067 | The Omaha Oozen Oz have moved Barry Garnett and Bob Wooden to the active roster. |