BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B-
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (12-02-2137) |
Potential |
D+ |
Age at Death |
74
|
Born |
08-20-2063 in Ellerbe, NC |
Drafted |
Round 3, Pick 42 (2084) |
Experience |
7 Years (153 Wks) |
College |
Vermont University, 2085 |
Salary |
745 ($23493.991M/2157 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
D |
Catching |
D+ |
Pass Cover |
B |
Kick Power |
D+ |
Throw Acc |
C- |
Pass Blocking |
F |
Run Cover |
B- |
Kick Acc |
C- |
Carrying |
D |
Run Blocking |
C- |
Tackling |
B- |
Kick Return |
B |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
B+ |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
B |
Stamina |
B- |
Execution |
C- |
Agility |
C+ |
Strength |
B |
Health |
D- |
Aggressiveness |
C |
Hands |
C- |
Jumping |
C |
|
|
Attitude |
D+ |
Break Tackle |
C- |
ROLES |
QB |
D |
C |
D |
DT |
C+ |
SS |
B- |
K |
F |
GUN |
C |
WR |
D+ |
G |
D+ |
DE |
C |
FS |
B- |
P |
F |
KR |
C |
HB/TB |
C- |
T |
C- |
ILB |
C+ |
CB |
C+ |
LS |
D |
KRB |
C- |
FB |
D+ |
TE |
D+ |
OLB |
C+ |
H |
F |
HT |
C- |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year | Type | QB | RB | WR | TE | C | G | T | DT | DE | LB | CB | S | K | P | ST |
2084 | Game | | | | | | | | | 0.2 | 1.9 | | 36.5 | | | |
2085 | Game | | | | | | | | | 1.3 | 3.1 | 0.5 | 93.9 | | | 7.6 |
2086 | Game | | | | | | | | | 0.6 | 1.5 | 2.2 | 89.4 | | | 7.7 |
2087 | Game | | | | | | | | 0.5 | 3.8 | 2.8 | 0.6 | 59.7 | | | 8.2 |
2091 | Game | | | | | | | | | | 2.3 | | 389.5 | | | 0.0 |
2092 | Game | | | | | | | | 0.6 | 1.1 | 1.9 | 5.5 | 436.7 | | | |
2093 | Game | | | | | | | | | | 0.3 | | 480.7 | | | 38.8 |
2094 | Game | | | | | | | | 1.0 | 1.3 | 1.2 | | 398.8 | | | 9.4 |
Numbers in this table represent the number of minutes played at each position. ST represents special teams positions other than K or P.
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2099 | Larry Jackson has retired from football. |
09-18-2095 | The Green Bay Blizzard have automatically waived Larry Jackson to comply with the 53-man roster limit. |
08-08-2095 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Bob Monds, Bob Coleman, Tony Brown, Bart Jackson, Don Koeper, Dixon Crooms, and Plato Parker to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Dick Hitchcock, Guy Oberbroekling, Darrell Age, Ray Moore, Bill Boston, Larry Jackson, Bob Bullard, and Dwight Johnson to the inactive roster. |
09-03-2091 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Lloyd Woods, Chuck Lucas, Jim Merlin, Larry Jackson, and Jim Fritsch to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Milo Digris, Damon Langhorne, Charley Gothard, Tony Principe, and Tim Reid to the inactive roster. |
08-08-2089 | The Green Bay Blizzard have acquired Larry Jackson from the waiver wire. |
09-05-2088 | The Green Bay Blizzard have waived Larry Jackson. |
08-09-2088 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Dante Chantiles, John Wilde, and Don Vollenweider to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Ray Moore, Greg Jones, Morris Fowler, and Larry Jackson to the inactive roster. |
08-06-2085 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Dino Davis, Michael Baker, Ed Yowarsky, Charley Gothard, Larry Jackson, Malik Thome, and Bob Bullard to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Jack Newsome, Joe Wetzel, Elmer Powell, Steve McEwen, Freeman Kostos, Chris Dahlgren, and Henry Geis to the inactive roster. |
09-03-2084 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Tim Reid to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Larry Jackson to the inactive roster. |
08-07-2084 | The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Joe Wetzel and Larry Jackson to the active roster. The Green Bay Blizzard have moved Robert Bligen and Tim Reid to the inactive roster. |