BIOGRAPHICAL DATA |
Total Rating |
B+
|
Conditioning |
95% |
Status |
Deceased (02-15-2037) |
Potential |
B |
Age at Death |
65
|
Born |
12-24-1971 in Phoenix, AZ |
Drafted |
Round 3, Pick 84 (1994) |
Experience |
11 Years (215 Wks) |
College |
North Carolina University, 1994 |
Salary |
2718 ($4861.392M/2116 $) |
OFFENSE |
DEFENSE |
SPEC TEAMS |
Throw Power |
A- |
Catching |
D+ |
Pass Cover |
D+ |
Kick Power |
D |
Throw Acc |
A- |
Pass Blocking |
D+ |
Run Cover |
D |
Kick Acc |
D |
Carrying |
B+ |
Run Blocking |
D+ |
Tackling |
C- |
Kick Return |
F |
|
|
|
|
Pursuit |
D- |
|
|
PHYSICAL |
MENTAL |
DEXTERITY |
Speed |
C |
Stamina |
B- |
Execution |
C |
Agility |
B+ |
Strength |
D+ |
Health |
D+ |
Aggressiveness |
D |
Hands |
A |
Jumping |
D |
|
|
Attitude |
A- |
Break Tackle |
C |
ROLES |
QB |
B+ |
C |
C- |
DT |
D+ |
SS |
D+ |
K |
F |
GUN |
C- |
WR |
C- |
G |
D+ |
DE |
D+ |
FS |
D+ |
P |
D |
KR |
C- |
HB/TB |
C+ |
T |
D+ |
ILB |
D+ |
CB |
C- |
LS |
C- |
KRB |
C- |
FB |
C- |
TE |
D+ |
OLB |
C- |
H |
B |
HT |
C+ |
KOS |
D- |
|
Year | Type | QB | RB | WR | TE | C | G | T | DT | DE | LB | CB | S | K | P | ST |
1994 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 3.7 |
1995 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 3.1 |
1996 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 12.3 |
1997 | Game | 0.0 | 14.2 | | | | | | | | | | | | | 10.7 |
1998 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 13.2 |
1999 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 14.2 |
2000 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 14.4 |
2001 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 12.2 |
2002 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 11.0 |
2003 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | 3.4 |
2004 | Game | 0.0 | | | | | | | | | | | | | | |
Numbers in this table represent the number of minutes played at each position. ST represents special teams positions other than K or P.
Career Transactions
Date | Transaction |
02-28-2005 | Kirby Lafleur has retired from the San Antonio Silver Hawks. |
11-01-2004 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Eric Chavous to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Kirby Lafleur to the inactive roster. |
09-02-2002 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Dewayne Sutherland, Lin Chlebek, Ernie Jones, Marv White, Jimmy Siegal, Dan Childress, Tony Janowicz, Tommy Bregel, Bob Long, Mike Epps, Dennis Jones, and Kirby Lafleur to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Tom Reuter, Norman Knapp, Aaron Unitas, Wade Furness, Anthony Lensing, Bill Strausbaugh, Clayton Smith, Eric Chavous, Carl Bleier, Cleveland Robb, Bill Patanelli, and Brian Grant to the inactive roster. |
08-26-2002 | The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Cleveland Robb, Bill Strausbaugh, and Norman Knapp to the active roster. The San Antonio Silver Hawks have moved Dan Childress, Jimmy Siegal, Tommy Bregel, and Kirby Lafleur to the inactive roster. |
09-06-1998 | Trade #56696 has been completed between the San Antonio Silver Hawks and the San Francisco Cylons. The San Francisco Cylons receive Draft Pick - 2000 Round 2 (SA) from the San Antonio Silver Hawks in exchange for Kirby Lafleur (QB). |
12-07-1997 | The San Francisco Cylons have placed Kirby Lafleur on the trade block. |
01-01-1995 | The San Francisco Cylons have removed Kirby Lafleur from the trade block. |
11-27-1994 | The San Francisco Cylons have moved Kirby Lafleur to the active roster. The San Francisco Cylons have moved Canute Powell to the inactive roster. |
10-30-1994 | The San Francisco Cylons have moved Canute Powell to the active roster. The San Francisco Cylons have moved Kirby Lafleur to the inactive roster. |
10-30-1994 | The San Francisco Cylons have placed Kirby Lafleur on the trade block. |
08-08-1994 | The San Francisco Cylons have moved Kirby Lafleur to the active roster. The San Francisco Cylons have moved Kevin Fitzhugh to the inactive roster. |