Numbers in this table represent the number of minutes played at each position. ST represents special teams positions other than K or P.
Date | Transaction |
02-28-1984 | Ricky Norris has retired from football. |
09-05-1983 | The Pittsburgh Ironheads have waived Ricky Norris. |
08-08-1983 | The Pittsburgh Ironheads have moved Jack Viltz and John Young to the active roster. The Pittsburgh Ironheads have moved Ricky Norris and Todd McGruder to the inactive roster. |
09-20-1982 | The Pittsburgh Ironheads have moved Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Pittsburgh Ironheads have moved Art Remsberg to the inactive roster. |
09-20-1982 | The Pittsburgh Ironheads have acquired Ricky Norris from the waiver wire. |
05-02-1982 | The Syracuse Shaman have waived Ricky Norris. |
09-10-1979 | The Syracuse Shaman have acquired Ricky Norris from the waiver wire. |
09-02-1979 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Rich Hunter, Walter Patulski, and Jack Law to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Jeff Mitchell, George Rogers, and Boyd Kostiuk to the inactive roster. |
09-02-1979 | The Winnipeg Jets have waived Ricky Norris. |
08-19-1979 | The Winnipeg Jets have placed Ricky Norris on the trade block. |
11-20-1978 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Carl Fain, Marvin Connor, Benny Reynolds, Thane Goodwin, Bob Mays, and Joe Parker to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Bob Woodard, Rich Hunter, Mike Gambino, Riall Talbert, Fod Fitzgerald, and Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
09-03-1978 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Riall Talbert, Brady Key, Derrick Pardridge, Hewritt Spiva, Fod Fitzgerald, Ricky Norris, Matt Fears, Lionel Feher, Rod Hill, Tommy Flowers, and Brian Duncan to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Nick Brown, Thane Goodwin, Chuck Oliver, Bob Mays, Carl Fain, and Rashad Gaison to the inactive roster. |
08-13-1978 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
09-04-1977 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Rich Hunter, Ashley West, Ricky Norris, and Tommy Flowers to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Simon Petty to the inactive roster. |
01-10-1977 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Riall Talbert, Ernie Mansfield, Herb Spellman, Ed Warren, Saul Peets, John Holmes, and Elmer Janowicz to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Bob Kyle, Cliff Small, Steve Selby, Karl Moore, Max Gibson, Ricky Norris, Graham Metzger, Ashley West, and Tommy Flowers to the inactive roster. |
09-06-1976 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Matt Fears, Steve Selby, Lionel Feher, Karl Moore, Max Gibson, David Darius, Graham Metzger, Riall Talbert, Bob Kyle, Rollie Bunyan, Ashley West, Brady Key, Todd Gogolak, and Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Paul Maynard, Mark Hayes, Simon Petty, Bruce Land, Ed Warren, Joe Ridler, Chuck Goodnight, and Fred Knight to the inactive roster. |
08-30-1976 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Brian Duncan to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris and Todd Gogolak to the inactive roster. |
08-11-1974 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Todd Gogolak to the inactive roster. |
08-05-1974 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Gerald Signaigo, Otto Medved, and Fred Knight to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
01-14-1974 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Joe Walton, Joe Battle, Ricky Norris, Chuck Goodnight, Pete Marshall, Riall Talbert, Joe Ridler, and Ernie O'Neal to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Clare Henry, Rick Preston, Bob Beisel, Steve Selby, Graham Metzger, Gary Lewis, Carl Fredricksen, Darrel Radick, Dub Toibin, George Kelly, Dennis Nix, Tom Bollinger, and Terry Wells to the inactive roster. |
11-25-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Tom Bollinger to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
11-11-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Pete Marshall and Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Tom Bollinger and Zack Kirk to the inactive roster. |
11-04-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Tom Bollinger to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
10-21-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Tom Bollinger to the inactive roster. |
08-20-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Gary Lewis, Dub Toibin, Terry Wells, Steve Selby, Karl Moore, Graham Metzger, Rick Preston, Tom Bollinger, Ashley West, Darrel Radick, Bob Beisel, Todd Gogolak, George Kelly, Dennis Nix, and Carl Fredricksen to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Ricky Norris, Joe Battle, Pete Marshall, Zack Kirk, Frank Medved, Paul Maynard, and Joe Ridler to the inactive roster. |
01-28-1973 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Pete Marshall, Joe Ridler, Speedy Cearing, Ricky Norris, Zack Kirk, and Walter Ontko to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Carl Fredricksen, Rick Preston, Nick Beck, Graham Metzger, Mark Jones, Darrel Radick, George Kelly, Dennis Nix, and Gary Lewis to the inactive roster. |
12-03-1972 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Carl Fredricksen, Monte Carlton, Speedy Cearing, Zack Kirk, Todd Gogolak, and Tom Bollinger to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Pete Marshall, Joe Ridler, Ricky Norris, Joe Battle, Joe Walton, Walter Ontko, and Chuck Goodnight to the inactive roster. |
11-12-1972 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Joe Battle, Ricky Norris, Chuck Goodnight, and Joe Ridler to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Adam Fleming, Pete Maskas, Kerry Carter, and Carl Fredricksen to the inactive roster. |
09-03-1972 | The Winnipeg Jets have moved Nick Beck, Ashley West, Clare Henry, Rick Preston, Harry Paratestes, Graham Metzger, Todd Gogolak, Zack Kirk, Carl Fredricksen, Mark Jones, Monte Carlton, Dennis Nix, Tom Bollinger, and Terry Wells to the active roster. The Winnipeg Jets have moved Joe Walton, Walter Ontko, Alonzo Moore, Joe Battle, Ricky Norris, Joel Bell, Pete Marshall, Riall Talbert, and Joe Ridler to the inactive roster. |
08-28-1972 | The Winnipeg Jets have acquired Ricky Norris from the waiver wire. |
08-21-1972 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have waived Ricky Norris. |
08-07-1972 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Waddell Segretta to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Ricky Norris to the inactive roster. |
11-15-1971 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Ricky Norris to the active roster. The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have moved Waddell Segretta to the inactive roster. |
10-31-1971 | The Minnesota SALT CROCODILES have acquired Ricky Norris from the waiver wire. |
08-09-1971 | The Chicago Crabs have waived Ricky Norris. |