Date | Transaction |
02-28-2059 | Dean Reese has retired from football. |
08-07-2056 | The San Jose Czars have waived Dean Reese. |
04-30-2056 | The San Jose Czars have acquired Dean Reese from the waiver wire. |
10-03-2055 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Earl Williams, Ed Natkin, Bruce Connelly, Brian Moynihan, John Kraker, Kelly Foote, and John Krauss to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Fletcher Oliver, George Wakefield, James Bruno, Sylvester Looney, Lew Carroll, Garcia Leonard, Flip Henderson, and Kim Dandy to the inactive roster. |
10-03-2055 | The Winnipeg Amish have waived Dean Reese. |
09-06-2055 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Cliff Carty, David Spinks, John Broussard, George Wakefield, Edward Brown, Flip Henderson, Ron Daniels, and Paul Williams to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Dean Reese, Brian Moynihan, Kelly Foote, Bruce Connelly, and Jimmy Parkinson to the inactive roster. |
08-15-2055 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Bob Barber, Ken Speth, Dean Reese, and Antonio Secord to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Jim Ceaser and John Broussard to the inactive roster. |
12-20-2054 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Forrest Herring and Ed Natkin to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Dean Reese and Edward Brown to the inactive roster. |
10-04-2054 | The Winnipeg Amish have placed Dean Reese on the trade block. |
09-06-2054 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Brian Jones, Anthony Samson, and Dean Reese to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Bob McGrew, Jim Ceaser, and Wayne Minor to the inactive roster. |
09-06-2054 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Flip Henderson, Trey Perantoni, Aaron Carolan, George Wakefield, Cliff Carty, David Spinks, Antonio Secord, Wayne Minor, Ron Daniels, and Bob Barber to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Brian Perkins, Earl Williams, Dean Reese, Anthony Samson, and Brian Jones to the inactive roster. |
12-01-2053 | The Winnipeg Amish have moved Dean Reese to the active roster. The Winnipeg Amish have moved Bob Barber to the inactive roster. |
12-01-2053 | The Winnipeg Amish have acquired Dean Reese from the waiver wire. |
08-25-2053 | The Green Bay Packers have waived Dean Reese. |
08-12-2052 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Ken Metzger to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Dean Reese to the inactive roster. |
08-05-2047 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Conrad Bergold, Dean Reese, Gerald Herring, and Sam Hutton to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Jim Roland, George Mergen, Mike Pederson, Tommy Dirks, and Dick Alexander to the inactive roster. |