Date | Transaction |
02-28-2074 | Steve Francis has retired from football. |
08-27-2073 | The Green Bay Packers have waived Steve Francis. |
08-27-2073 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Paul Songin, Marty Ledbetter, John Duren, Bob Fryer, and Darryl Brown to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Alan Carter, Steve Francis, John Mills, Van Dudek, and Sam Grant to the inactive roster. |
08-22-2072 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Steve Francis and Van Dudek to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved John Duren to the inactive roster. |
08-22-2072 | The Green Bay Packers have moved John Masters, John Wilson, Ira Bass, and Steve Larpentar to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Steve Francis, Van Dudek, and Dave Peterson to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2071 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Steve Francis and Sam Grant to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Ed Koss, Frank Hannula, Izzy Chapura, and Bob Rogers to the inactive roster. |
09-07-2071 | The Green Bay Packers have moved John Mills, Izzy Chapura, Reggie Rogers, Billy Shaw, Sam Best, Nathan Nowak, and Obert Saumer to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Irvin Hansen, Ricky Lamb, Steve Francis, Sam Grant, and Tim Achicha to the inactive roster. |
08-19-2069 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Danny Martin, Steve Francis, and Marcus Sparkman to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Sam Woods, Davlin Miller, Rico Karmazin, and Dan Fields to the inactive roster. |
04-28-2069 | The Green Bay Packers have moved Sam Woods and Carroll Miller to the active roster. The Green Bay Packers have moved Terry Jones and Steve Francis to the inactive roster. |
08-20-2068 | The Green Bay Packers have acquired Steve Francis from the waiver wire. |
01-23-2068 | The Indianapolis Ponies have waived Steve Francis. |
01-22-2068 | The Indianapolis Ponies have acquired Steve Francis from the waiver wire. |
08-28-2067 | The Indianapolis Ponies have waived Steve Francis. |
09-17-2063 | The Indianapolis Ponies have moved Gary Talley, Jack Benefield, and Steve Francis to the active roster. The Indianapolis Ponies have moved Billy Nacrelli, Ed Kelley, and Dan Cade to the inactive roster. |
09-02-2063 | The Indianapolis Ponies have moved Jeff Baynham, Gary Drulis, James Witkowski, Vee Klawitter, Tommy Detmer, Ed Kelley, Charley Cramer, Jim Mahrt, and Kenny Long to the active roster. The Indianapolis Ponies have moved Stan Neal, George Kurisko, Jonas Papale, Maury Polisky, Steve Francis, and Terry Klingler to the inactive roster. |
08-27-2063 | The Indianapolis Ponies have acquired Steve Francis from the waiver wire. |
08-19-2063 | The Virginia Cavalry have waived Steve Francis. |
09-04-2062 | The Virginia Cavalry have moved Steve Francis to the active roster. |