Date | Transaction |
02-28-2048 | Alamalam Malamala has retired from football. |
10-01-2045 | The Minnesota Wolves have waived Alamalam Malamala. |
08-13-2045 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved Neal McClanahan to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Alamalam Malamala to the inactive roster. |
04-30-2045 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved John Shlapak, Emmett Conner, Jason Milton, Larry O'Reilly, Deke Walker, Merril Fena, Bob Songin, Alamalam Malamala, Charles Fuller, and Don O'Steen to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Charlie Kolesar, Kurt Phillips, Jason Olenski, Mike Maloney, Ralf Vlasic, Golden Jelley, Billy Woulfe, Doc McKinnon, and Harold Muray to the inactive roster. |
04-30-2045 | The Minnesota Wolves have acquired Alamalam Malamala from the waiver wire. |
09-18-2044 | The Minnesota Wolves have waived Alamalam Malamala. |
09-04-2044 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved Bob Dwyer and Jack Williams to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Joe Dirt and Alamalam Malamala to the inactive roster. |
05-01-2044 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved Ree Joyce, Jack Gray, Emmett Conner, John Hodge, Larry O'Reilly, Lou Lilly, Charlie Hatchett, Joe Dirt, Carlos Campanella, Rolland Nutten, Bob Songin, Alamalam Malamala, Joe Powell, and Len Howard to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Rich Gentry, Bob Ryan, Kurt Phillips, Jason Olenski, Ralf Vlasic, Golden Jelley, Billy Woulfe, Randy Washington, Carl Tullis, James Stephenson, Alphonso Smith, Harold Muray, and Bob Dwyer to the inactive roster. |
01-18-2044 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved Jason Milton, Don Turner, and Charlie Rhone to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Charlie Hatchett, Bob Songin, and Alamalam Malamala to the inactive roster. |
08-10-2043 | The Minnesota Wolves have moved John Shlapak, Rich Gentry, Obafemi Sendlein, Roy East, Will Staff, Steve Young, Chuck Thompson, John Hunt, Carlos Campanella, Rolland Nutten, Joe Manley, Lee Godfrey, George Bradley, Alamalam Malamala, Sod Crow, Riley Clark, and John Billman to the active roster. The Minnesota Wolves have moved Buddy Lee, Ted Anbil, Bob Ryan, Willie Jackson, Kurt Phillips, Jason Olenski, Buck Snort, Ralf Vlasic, Golden Jelley, Paul Duke, Rodney Brown, James Stephenson, Alphonso Smith, Harold Muray, Walt Peacock, Ed Knecht, and Bob Dwyer to the inactive roster. |
05-03-2043 | The Minnesota Wolves have acquired Alamalam Malamala from the waiver wire. |
09-08-2042 | The Philadelphia Federalists have waived Alamalam Malamala. |
08-25-2042 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Charley Collins, Kenneth King, Benny Woodcock, Matt Miller, John Alexander, Larry Jackson, and Russell Ferguson to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Hoochie Kuechenberg, James Wells, Fred Cook, Alamalam Malamala, Linden Sellers, and Karl Dean to the inactive roster. |
08-17-2042 | The Philadelphia Federalists have changed Justin Malamala's name to Alamalam Malamala. |
12-02-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Justin Malamala to the active roster. |
11-11-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Koy Andrusking to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Justin Malamala to the inactive roster. |
11-04-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Justin Malamala to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Koy Andrusking to the inactive roster. |
10-07-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Doug Stallings and Brad Krakoski to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Justin Malamala and Terry Lucky to the inactive roster. |
09-02-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Justin Malamala to the active roster. The Philadelphia Federalists have moved Fred Cook to the inactive roster. |
04-28-2041 | The Philadelphia Federalists have acquired Justin Malamala from the waiver wire. |
08-09-2038 | The Portland Rage have waived Justin Malamala. |
09-03-2035 | Justin Malamala has been moved from C to G by the Western Kentucky College Summits. |