Date | Transaction |
02-28-2054 | Glenn Comber has retired from football. |
09-18-2051 | The Toronto Toros have waived Glenn Comber. |
01-02-2051 | The Toronto Toros have moved Bob Farren, Kevin Beinor, Tom Lazetich, John Rumph, Charles Hall, Chris Delaney, Mike Black, Harry McDonald, McKinley Kinney, Dan Gogan, Wally Anderson, and Mike Holt to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Johnny Matthews, Frank Geri, Paul Shaw, Cory Bolger, Glenn Comber, Ron Cullen, Paul Davis, and Dick Henry to the inactive roster. |
12-26-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Ron Cullen, Dick Henry, Frank Geri, Paul Shaw, Cory Bolger, Glenn Comber, Johnny Matthews, and Paul Davis to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Wally Anderson, Bob Farren, Charles Hall, McKinley Kinney, Dan Gogan, Harry McDonald, Mike Holt, and John Rumph to the inactive roster. |
12-05-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Johnny Matthews and Bud Lipscomb to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Frank Geri, Glenn Comber, and Jon Rutledge to the inactive roster. |
11-28-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber and Tino Bernhardt to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Eli Keisel to the inactive roster. |
11-14-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Johnny Matthews, Frank Geri, Tino Bernhardt, and Eli Keisel to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Kevin Mackert, Bud Lipscomb, and Jon Rutledge to the inactive roster. |
09-05-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Mike Holt, Glenn Comber, and Reggie Hubbert to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Jon Rutledge, Eli Keisel, and Cory Bolger to the inactive roster. |
08-08-2050 | The Toronto Toros have moved Eli Keisel to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber to the inactive roster. |
08-14-2044 | The Toronto Toros have moved Jim Romero, Glenn Comber, Lawrence Howard, McKinley Kinney, Jim Terry, and John Norris to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Buddy Simmons, Jimmy Randolph, Lou Kiick, Bill Jozwiak, Dave Jacke, and Alvin Clay to the inactive roster. |
01-10-2044 | The Toronto Toros have moved Palmer Talbott, Bill Jozwiak, Wayne Montgomery, Hank Coleman, Jerry Winters, Naz Thomas, James Loukas, and Buddy Simmons to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Al Spiegel, Glenn Comber, Andy Thompson, Jim Romero, John Norris, McKinley Kinney, Jim Terry, and Mark Stonebreaker to the inactive roster. |
12-14-2043 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, McKinley Kinney, Reggie Hubbert, and Mike Holt to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Buddy Simmons, Mark Stonebreaker, Bill Jozwiak, and Dave Jacke to the inactive roster. |
11-23-2043 | The Toronto Toros have moved Bob Farren, Jim Romero, James Loukas, and Kevin Mackert to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Ralph Dexter, Reggie Hubbert, and Andy Thompson to the inactive roster. |
08-24-2043 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Kevin Mackert, and Mike Black to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Vito McKenzie and Mike Chavez to the inactive roster. |
12-15-2042 | The Toronto Toros have moved Vito McKenzie to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber to the inactive roster. |
10-13-2042 | The Toronto Toros have moved Bob Farren, Dermontti Callahan, Dale Simpson, Tom Lazetich, Ron MacDonald, and Glenn Comber to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glen Christianson, Anthony Durham, Kevin Mackert, Reuben Richardson, and Mark Stonebreaker to the inactive roster. |
10-06-2042 | The Toronto Toros have moved Gene Morrison, Kevin Mackert, Reuben Richardson, Mark Stonebreaker, and Glen Christianson to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Bob Farren, Dermontti Callahan, Dale Simpson, Tom Lazetich, Ron MacDonald, and Glenn Comber to the inactive roster. |
12-30-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Wayne Montgomery, Buddy Simmons, Glenn Comber, James Loukas, Erik Waddy, and Mark Rovinski to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Compagno, McKinley Kinney, Harvey Johnson, Louie Markov, Kevin Mackert, and Mike Holt to the inactive roster. |
11-11-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Eric Burton, Harold Weber, James Loukas, and Jerry Winters to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Maurice Hunter, and Harvey Johnson to the inactive roster. |
11-04-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber to the active roster. |
09-30-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Vito McKenzie to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber to the inactive roster. |
09-09-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Vito McKenzie to the inactive roster. |
09-02-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Buddy Simmons, Anthony Woodard, Glenn Compagno, and John Ryan to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Kevin Mackert, McKinley Kinney, and Reggie Hubbert to the inactive roster. |
08-05-2041 | The Toronto Toros have moved Glenn Comber, Jack Frazier, McKinley Kinney, Reggie Hubbert, and Kevin Mackert to the active roster. The Toronto Toros have moved Buddy Simmons, Alvin Clay, Glenn Compagno, Anthony Woodard, and John Ryan to the inactive roster. |