Date | Transaction |
02-28-2004 | Wayland Hart has retired from football. |
12-18-2000 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Fred Harlan to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Floyd Houghton to the inactive roster. |
12-18-2000 | The Washington Capitolists have waived Wayland Hart. |
11-19-2000 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Wayland Hart on the trade block. |
10-09-2000 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Lance Jue to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
09-24-2000 | The Washington Capitolists have acquired Wayland Hart from the waiver wire. |
04-30-2000 | The Washington New World Order have waived Wayland Hart. |
12-27-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Darius Moxley to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
12-13-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Major Eridanus and Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Francois Damocles and Burt Kelcher to the inactive roster. |
09-20-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Wayland Hart on the trade block. |
09-20-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Kirk Aimes to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
09-20-1999 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. |
12-27-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Francois Damocles to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
11-29-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Francois Damocles to the inactive roster. |
10-12-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Ben "Magic Killer" Whey to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
09-28-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart and Mark Zupek to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Tim Hendel and Ben "Magic Killer" Whey to the inactive roster. |
09-07-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie, Chris Miranoi, Hans Heidenreich, Nolan Creed, Billy Doink, Reuben Carson, Rickey McDaniel, Rob Constantine, Tim Hendel, Bob Crockett, Tom Marvel, and Steve Hardison to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Reggie Johnson, Jack Handey, Pauly Tanaka, Jim Scolnik, Charley Tausch, Wayland Hart, and Ray Brunson to the inactive roster. |
08-31-1998 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Reggie Johnson, Pauly Tanaka, Charley Tausch, Wayland Hart, and Ray Brunson to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Chris Miranoi, Nolan Creed, Billy Doink, Reuben Carson, Rickey McDaniel, Rob Constantine, and Steve Hardison to the inactive roster. |
10-26-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Bob Sacramento and Steve Hardison to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart and Judah "The Lion" Fidel to the inactive roster. |
10-05-1997 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Nolan "Credence" Creed and Steve Hardison to the inactive roster. |
11-11-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Lewis to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Wayland Hart from the trade block. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Lewis to the inactive roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
10-28-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Benji Soong, Jack Handey, and Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Paul Erie, Teddy Mayberry, and Ken Belanger to the inactive roster. |
09-22-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Wayland Hart on the trade block. |
08-26-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Sam Mitchell to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
08-26-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Sam Mitchell to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
08-25-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved James Blazzario to the inactive roster. |
08-19-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have removed Wayland Hart from the trade block. |
01-01-1996 | The Washington Capitolists have placed Wayland Hart on the trade block. |
12-18-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Lewis to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
12-03-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Greg Lewis to the inactive roster. |
11-27-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved John Taves to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
11-27-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. |
11-27-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. |
10-30-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Amaedus Oans to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart and Paul Lewis to the inactive roster. |
08-28-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Ishmael Levinson to the inactive roster. |
08-27-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Vince Nash and Holland Cruise to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart and Paul Lewis to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart, Bo Riley, Cleveland Yarborough, Paul Lewis, Gene Percy, Kevin Treadwell, and Ozzie Uwaezuoke to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Steve Hardison, Tom Silvers, Chuck Bumgardner, Tom Marvel, Nolan Creed, Greg Lewis, Hans Heidenreich, Don Anderson, and Chris Miranoi to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Vince Nash to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have moved Wayland Hart, Lucius Lane, Grant Rowe, Paris Thomas, Del Patel, Ahmad "Walls" Jericho, Thom Riddle, Holland Cruise, Blaine Stark, and Jeff Wilson to the active roster. The Washington Capitolists have moved Tom Silvers, Bo Riley, Cleveland Yarborough, Gene Percy, and Kevin Treadwell to the inactive roster. |
08-07-1995 | The Washington Capitolists have changed Eddie Chryplewicz's name to Wayland Hart. |